+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- As adopted by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield reported for the Committee on Rules
- Adopted in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended and resolution messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Rep. Long of Newfane moved to commit the resolution to the Committee on Rules, which was agreed to
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Rep. Long of Newfane moved to postpone action until May 4, 2021 which was agreed to
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Rep. Long of Newfane moved to postpone action until April 29, 2021 which was agreed to
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Rep. Long of Newfane moved to postpone action until April 28, 2021 which was agreed to
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 33
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted on the part of the Senate
- New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & placed on Notice Calendar per Rule 34
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor