+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Government Operations
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & adopted
- Division 9-20, as requested by Senator Sears
- Motion disagreed to
- Point of order sustained by the President
- Point of order raised by Senator(s) Degree
- Senator Sears motion to order bill to lie
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 7
- Reported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Sears
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Judiciary per Rule 51
+ − Vote
April 4, 2017: Shall the resolution be read the third time?
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7