+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on January 24, 2012
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on January 18, 2012
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
On January 4, 2012 in the House:
- Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
On January 3, 2012 in the House:
- Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Donovan of Burlington
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Motion by Senator Lyons that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment
- Motion agreed to
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to postpone action until 4/4/2011 which was disagreed to
- Rep. Olsen of Jamaica moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
- Rep. Crawford of Burke moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
- Read Third time
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 88
- Floor Amendment by Rep. Consejo of Sheldon disagreed to
- Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 65 of 129 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 37
- Report of Committee on Education agreed to.
- Read Second Time
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Rep. Rep. Buxton of Royalton reported for the committee on Education
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
- Read 2nd time
- Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2011: Shall the House allow Rep. Consejo of Sheldon to amend the bill after third reading?
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 88
- Absent: 10
May 2, 2011: Shall the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill as recommended by the committee on Education?
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 19
March 18, 2011: Shall the bill pass?
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor