+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on May 31, 2022
- Delivered to Governor on May 25, 2022
On May 7, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment; text
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- House Proposal of Amendment
- House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Action Calendar: Third reading
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading ordered
- Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to
- Rep. Small of Winooski reported for the Committee on Human Services
- Read Second time
- Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the Committee on Health Care be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the Committee on Human Services which was agreed to
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Health Care
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Motion agreed to
- Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Terenzini, Cummings, Hardy, Hooker, and Lyons
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Terenzini, Cummings, Hardy, Hooker, and Lyons
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Terenzini, Cummings, Hardy, Hooker, and Lyons
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Reported favorably by Senator Terenzini for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare