+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary
- Read 2nd time
- Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
- Second Reading
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor