+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (65)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on June 14, 2017
- Signed by Governor on 6/14/17
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on 6/9/17
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) White; text
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 120, Nays = 24
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Which was agreed to
- Which was disagreed to
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 33, Nays = 109
- Rep. Yantachka of Charlotte moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
- Which was agreed to
- Rep. Townsend of South Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
- Rep. Poirier of Barre City moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
- Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
- Which was agreed to
- Read Third time
- Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 144, Nays = 1
- Which was agreed to
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Townsend of South Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Report of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to
- Rep. Townsend of South Burlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations, which was agreed to.
- Rep. Deen of Westminster moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations, which was agreed to.
- Third Reading Ordered
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, Pearson, Pollina, and White
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Benning, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, Pearson, and White moved to amend bill
- Proposal of amendment agreed to
- Read 3rd time & passed
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Benning, Ayer, Collamore, Clarkson, Pearson, and White
- New Business/Third Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Sears to Recommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Appropriations
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
- Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
- Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, text
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations amended as moved by Senator Sears
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 10, 2017: Shall the House concur with the Senate proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 120
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 5
May 2, 2017: Shall the House proposal of amendment be further amended as offered by Rep. Poirier of Barre City?
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 109
- Absent: 7
May 2, 2017: Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 144
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor