+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on April 27, 2022
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, signed by Governor April 27, 2022
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on April 21.2022
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House message: House passed bill in concurrence
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Read Third time and passed in concurrence
- Action Calendar: Third reading
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
- Action Calendar: Favorable
- Rep. Pugh of South Burlington reported for the Committee on Human Services
- Read Second time
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield demanded yeas and nays
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 41, Nays = 98
- Which was disagreed to
- Third Reading ordered
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Favorable
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment agreed to
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Health and Welfare
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
+ − Vote
April 13, 2022: Shall the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield?
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 98
- Absent: 10