+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on May 15, 2009
- Delivered to Governor on May 9, 2009
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment; text
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
- Rep. Brennan of Colchester reported for the committee on Transportation
- Rep. Masland of Thetford reported for the committee on Ways and Means
- Read Second Time and Third Reading Ordered
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Motion by Senator Miller to reconsider passage of bill by the Senate agreed to
- Motion by Senator Miller to suspend rules to take bill up for immediate consideration disagreed to on division Yeas 12, Nays 10, a 3/4 majority being required
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Miller
- Pending third reading, motion to amend bill disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Bartlett, Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 11, Nays = 17
- Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Starr, Illuzzi, and Miller
- Read 3rd time & passed on division Yeas 20,Nays 8
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Reported favorably by Senator Maynard for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
- Read 2nd time
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to on division, yeas 16, nays 12
- 3rd reading ordered
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
- Second Reading
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48
+ − Vote
February 25, 2009: Pending third reading, shall the bill be amended as moved by Senators Miller, Illuzzi and Starr?
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor