+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on May 26, 2016
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2016
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sirotkin; text
- Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Rep. Savage of Swanton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
- Which was agreed to
- Senate proposal of amendment considered
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
- As passed by Senate and House
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 142, Nays = 0
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 49
- Rep. Ancel of Calais asked that the question be divided
- Which was agreed to
- Rep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to amend the report of the committee on Ways and Means
- Rep. Young of Glover, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
- Read Second Time
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways & Means
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 32 V.S.A. §7402 - Definitions
- 32 V.S.A. §7442a - Imposition of a Vermont estate tax and rate of tax
- 32 V.S.A. §7444 - Return by executor
- 32 V.S.A. §7475 - Adoption of federal estate and gift tax laws
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2016: Shall the House propose to the Senate to amend sections 5 through 17 and 18(b) only?
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 7
April 29, 2016: Shall the House propose to the Senate to amend sections 1-4 and 18(a) ?
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor