+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title amended as recommended by Committee on Judiciary
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) White
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) White
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
- Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor