+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 29, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 28, 2018
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on June 28, 2018
On June 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on June 22, 2018
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Read Third time
- Passed in concurrence
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence
- As passed by Senate and House
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe
- 3rd reading ordered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48