+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
- House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Rep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
- Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Read Second time
- Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
- Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to
- Third Reading ordered
- Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
- Read 3rd time & passed
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ram for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
- Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs