+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 10, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 5, 2014
On May 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on June 3, 2014
- Signed by Governor on June 5, 2014
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House message House passed bill in concurrence
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 78, Nays = 59
- Passed in Concurrence
- Read Third time
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 53, Nays = 86
- Rep. Bouchard of Colchester moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was disagreed to
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rep. Rep. Keenan of St. Albans City reported for the committee on Appropriations
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 81
- Rep. Dickinson of St. Albans Town moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Appropriations which was not agreed to.
- Third Reading Ordered
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 70, Nays = 64
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
- Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) McCormack
- Motion to amend bill agreed to
- Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Bray
- Senator(s) Mullin moved to amend motion to amend offered by Senator Bray, which was disagreed to
- Division of the Senate Yeas 12, Nays 13
- Motion to amend agreed to on a roll call, requested by Senator Ayer, Passed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 15, Nays = 10
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Collins moved to amend bill
- Motion to amend disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Collins, Failed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 4, Nays = 21
- Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 7
- Senator Campbell explained vote
- Senator Collins explained vote
- Senator Mullin explained vote
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
- New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) McCormack
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) McCormack
- Read 2nd time
- Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
- Recommendation of amendment agreed to
- Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) McCormack, text
- Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Mullin, text
- Point of order raised by Senator Galbraith on ground that proposed amendment was not germane
- Point of order sustained by the President
- Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Mullin, text
- Senator Mullin requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment
- 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 8
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48
+ − Votes (8)
May 6, 2014: Shall the house proposal of amendment be further amended as offered by Rep. Bouchard of Colchester?
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 86
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2014: Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 12
May 5, 2014: Shall the bill be recommitteed to the committee on Appropriations?
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 81
- Absent: 13
May 5, 2014: Shall the bill be read a third time?
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 15
February 28, 2014: Shall the bill be amended as moved by Senator Bray?
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 5
February 28, 2014: Shall the bill pass?
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2014: Shall the bill be amended as moved by Senator Collins?
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2014: Shall the bill be read the third time?
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor