+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Health and Welfare
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor