+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (92)
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Senate Message, Signed by Governor July 1, 2020
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on June 30, 2020
- As passed by Senate and House
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
- Signed by Governor on July 1, 2020
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock
- Senator Brock moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
- House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Brock
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On June 12, 2020 in the House:
- Report of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to.
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs reported for the committee on Energy and Technology
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Third Reading Ordered
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Title amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance
- 3rd reading ordered
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On May 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance