+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (76)
On May 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on June 3, 2010
- Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Delivered to Governor on May 28, 2010
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
On May 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consideration Postponed/House Proposal of Amendment
- Consideration resumed
- Senator Sears requested & granted leave to withdraw proposals of amendment
- Senator Sears, on behalf of the Committee on Judiciary, moved that Senate concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
- Senator(s) Campbell, Nitka, and McCormack motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
- Senator Campbell requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Sears
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Rep. Poirier of Barre City moved to concur in the Senate prop of amend with a further amend thereto
- Second Instance of amendment agreed to
- First Instance of amendment disagreed to
- Rep. Poirier of Barre City demanded yeas and nays
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 65 of 128 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 106
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Poirier of Barre City
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
On May 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Pending the question, shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. Poirier of Barre City, the question was divided
On May 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Motion by Senator Sears that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
- Motion by Senator Sears that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment
- Motion by Senator Sears that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment
- Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Sears
On May 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears on behalf of Committee on Judiciary
- Consideration Postponed/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Shumlin
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On April 30, 2010 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Rep. Lorber of Burlington, Branagan of Georgia, and Haas of Rochester moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Myers of Essex reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions
- Rep. Myers of Essex moved to amend the recommendation of amendment offered by Corrections and Institutions
- Rep. Lorber of Burlington, Branagan of Georgia, and Haas of Rochester moved to amend the recommendation of amendment offered by Corrections and Institutions
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Lorber of Burlington substituted as offered by Rep. Myers of Essex
- Rep. Myers of Essex moved to substitute an amendment for the amendment offered by Rep. Lorber of Burlington which was agreed to
- Amendment of Rep. Myers of Essex as substituted agreed to
- Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to
- Rep. Morrissey of Bennington demanded yeas and nays
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 113, Nays = 25
- Third Reading Ordered
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- Committed to Committee on Corrections and Institutions by motion of Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Brock
- Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Brock
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Choate
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
- Read 3rd time & passed
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi
- Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Choate
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
- Read 2nd time
- Floor amendment by Senator Sears agreed to
- Floor amendment by Senator Illuzzi agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed without objection
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Choate
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
- New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2010: Shall the House concur with the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Poirier of Barre City in Sec. 17, subsection 102(b)(16)?
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 106
- Absent: 21
April 29, 2010: Shall the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill as recommended by the Committee on Corrections and Institutions, as further amended?
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor