+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 10, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 28, 2014
On May 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
- Delivered to Governor on May 22, 2014
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Read Third time
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- Rep. Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Judiciary
- Third Reading Ordered
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to postpone action until May 5, 2014 which was agreed to
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Rep. Sweaney of Windsor moved that the committee on Government Operations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor