+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs with the report of Committee on Agriculture intact, on motion of Senator Illuzzi
- Committee on Appropriations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs on motion of Senator Illuzzi
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs relieved; bill committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Illuzzi
On January 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs