+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
- Rep. Jessup of Middlesex reported for the committee on Judiciary
- Read Second Time
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- New Business/Second Reading
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor