+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on May 7, 2010
On May 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on May 3, 2010
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On April 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Read Third time
On April 16, 2010 in the House:
- Amendment of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to and Third Reading Ordered
- Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Appropriations agreed to
- Rep. Winters of Williamstown reported for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Weston of Burlington reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Read Second Time
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On March 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to
- Reported favorably by Senator Bartlett for Committee on Appropriations
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy
On January 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor