+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on May 9, 2012
- Delivered to Governor on May 8, 2012
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On April 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On April 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield withdrawn
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to propose to the Senate to amend the bill
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to
- Third Reading Ordered
On April 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rep. Rep. Till of Jericho reported for the committee on Health Care
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
- Read 2nd time
- Reported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare with recommendation of amendment
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor