+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
- House proposal of amendment; text
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- First Instance of amendment agreed to
- Rep. Buckholz of Hartford and Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield asked that the question be divided
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 62 of 123 to Pass -- Yeas = 53, Nays = 70
- Second instance of amendment disagreed to
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Rep. Keefe of Manchester reported for the committee on Human Services
- Rep. Rachelson of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Report of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of the Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by the Committee on Human Services
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Rep. Grad of Moretown moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to.
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Grad of Moretown
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
- Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 10, 2018: Shall the Senate concur with the House proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 29
- Absent: 1
May 7, 2018: Shall the House proposal of amendment be further amended as offered by Rep. Buckholz of Hartford and Rep. Donahue of Northfield in the second instance of amendment only (Sections 2-5)?
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 70
- Absent: 26
February 23, 2018: Shall the bill be read the third time?
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor