+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (76)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Veto of the Governor sustained on a roll call Yeas = 0, Nays = 30
- Pending Question: Shall the bill pass, the failure of the Governor to approve notwithstanding?
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to January 24, 2018
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed January 24, 2018
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to January 24, 2018
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to January 24, 2018
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to Wednesday, January 24, 2018 on motion of Senator Ashe
- Pending Question: Shall the bill pass, the refusal of the Governor to sign, notwithstanding?
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to January 16, 2018
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to Tuesday, January 16, 2018
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to Tuesday, January 16, 2018
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to Tuesday, January 16, 2018 on motion of Senator Ashe
- Consideration postponed To Tuesday, January 9, 2018
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to Tuesday, January 9, 2018
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to January 9, 2018
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to Tuesday, January 9, 2018 on motion of Senator Ashe
- Pending Question: Shall the bill pass, the veto of the Governor notwithstanding?
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor vetoed bill; text of Governor's veto message
- Vetoed by Governor & placed on notice calendar for June 21, 2017
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor vetoed bill on May 24, 2017
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on May 18, 2017
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 79, Nays = 66
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending Question: Shall the Senate concur in the House proposal of amendment to the Senate proposal of amendment?
- Called up by Senator Sears & placed on action calendar for May 5, 2017
- Called Up
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Senator Sears moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
- Point of order on ground of lack of germaneness raised by Senator Collamore overruled
- Proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 9
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Sears
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Rep. Colburn of Burlington moved to concur with the Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment with a further amendment thereto
- Which was agreed to
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Senator Sears moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
- Motion agreed to
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Rep. Colburn of Burlington and Conquest of Newbury moved that the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill which was agreed to
- Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Read Third time
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
- Rep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
- Read Second Time
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
- Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Sears
- Read 3rd time & passed
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
January 24, 2018: Shall the bill pass, notwithstanding the Governor's refusal to approve the bill?
- Nays: 30
May 10, 2017: Shall the House concur in the Senate proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment to the Senate proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 66
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor