+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education agreed to
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Mullin for Committee on Education
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEducation
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor