+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (63)
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Title amended as recommended by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On May 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
On April 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor