+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on June 2, 2016
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on June 1, 2016
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
- As passed by Senate and House
- Committee of Conference report adopted
- Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Nitka for Committee, text
- New Business/Committee of Conference Report
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- House message House adopted Conference Committee report
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Committee of Conference Report
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- House message House appointed Conference Committee members
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker appointed Hubert of Milton, Evans of Essex and Lewis of Berlin as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Nitka, White, and Benning
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sears
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On April 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- House Proposal of Amendment
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Rep. Hubert of Milton moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to
- Rep. Branagan of Georgia asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
- Rep. Branagan of Georgia, Berry of Manchester, Clarkson of Woodstock, Feltus of Lyndon, Donahue of Northfield, McCullough of Williston, Rachelson of Burlington, Troiano of Stannard, and Sheldon of Middlebury moved to amend the House proposal of am
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 113, Nays = 17
- Rep. Hubert of Milton reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Campbell
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
April 20, 2016: Shall the bill be read a third time?
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor