+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 10, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 28, 2014
- Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 28, 2014
On May 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
- Delivered to Governor on May 22, 2014
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read Third time
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Mook of Bennington reported for the committee on Government Operations
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Division of the Senate Yeas 8, Nays 20
- Motion disagreed to
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Hartwell moved to amend bill
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
- 3rd reading ordered
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator French
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Galbraith
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator French
- Pending Question: Shall the recommendation of Government Operations be amended as moved by Sen. Benning?
- Consideration postponed to February 26, 2014
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as moved by Senator Sears
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations
- Senator Benning moved to strike out Subsection (c) of 17 VSA 2651d, in Sec. 6 of amendment of the Committee on Government Operations
- Consideration postponed to February 26, 2014 on motion of Senator White
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor