+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 2/24/10
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on 2/18/10
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed without objection
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Judiciary
- Read Second Time
- Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- Third Reading Ordered
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
On January 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Motion to amend bill agreed to
- Senator Campbell, on behalf of Committee on Judiciary, moved to amend bill; text
- Read 2nd time
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Campbell
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On January 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On January 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor