+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, signed by Governor April 27, 2022
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on April 27, 2022
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on April 21, 2022
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House message: House passed bill in concurrence
On April 15, 2022 in the House:
- Read Third time and passed in concurrence
- Action Calendar: Third reading
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading ordered
- Rep. Rachelson of Burlington reported for the Committee on Judiciary
- Read Second time
- Action Calendar: Favorable
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Favorable
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor