+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (63)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 20, 2019
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on June 20, 2019
- Delivered to Governor on June 17, 2019
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- Committee of Conference report adopted
- Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Pearson for Committee, text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Report
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House message House adopted Conference Committee report
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- House message House appointed Conference Committee members
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Rep. Masland of Thetford and Briglin of Thetford moved that the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Rep. Masland of Thetford asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Starr
- House proposal of amendment; text
- House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Starr
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Pearson, Hardy, and Pollina
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker appointed Bartholomew of Hartland, Bock of Chester and Strong of Albany as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Rep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Partridge of Windham reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
- Rep. Masland of Thetford recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
- Report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
- Report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
- Report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as offered by Rep. Partridge of Windham
- Report of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry as amended agreed to
- Third Reading Ordered
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Read 2nd time
- Reported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
- Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48