+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on May 29, 2013
- Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Ancel of Calais
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on May 23, 2013
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 95, Nays = 40
- Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Read Third time
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Poirier of Barre City disagreed to
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 103 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 39, Nays = 98
- Rule suspension to permit consideration of a non germane question as moved by Rep. Browning of Arlington disagreed to.
- Amendment of Rep. Browning of Arlington ruled not germane
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Fisher of Lincoln agreed to
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Till of Jericho withdrawn
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Rep. Sharpe of Bristol, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Fisher of Lincoln reported for the committee on Health Care
- Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to
- Rep. Keenan of St. Albans City, recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Fisher of Lincoln agreed to
- Third Reading Ordered
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
- Placed on Calendar for Notice on 4/25/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2013: Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 14
May 9, 2013: Shall the House suspend its rules to take up consideration of a non-germane question?
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 98
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor