+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Senate message, adheres to its position
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Pugh of South Burlington for the committee on Human Services reported without recommendation
- Rep. Toll of Danville moved to amend the bill
- Which was agreed to
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Pearson
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Senator Pearson moved to not concur in House proposal of amendment and that the Senate ADHERE
- Motion agreed to
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Pearson
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Starr, Collamore, Hardy, Pearson, Pollina, and Parent
- Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Starr, Collamore, Hardy, Pearson, Pollina, and Parent
- Recommendation of amendment agreed to
- Read 3rd time & passed
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare