+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rep Sharpe of Bristol moved to recommit the bill to the Committee on Education which was agreed to
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rep. Sharpe of Bristol moved to postpone action until May 5, 2017 which was agreed to
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rep. Sharpe of Bristol moved to postpone action until May 4, 2017 which was agreed to
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rep. Sharpe of Bristol moved to postpone action until May 3, 2017 which was agreed to
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rep. Sharpe of Bristol moved to postpone action until May 2, 2017 which was agreed to
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rep. Sharpe of Bristol moved to postpone action until April 29, 2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
- Read 3rd time & passed
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Degree moved to amend bill
- Pending third reading, motion to amend bill agreed to
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth, Balint, Benning, Bray, Ingram, and Mullin
- Read 2nd time
- Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance
- Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
- Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Baruth, Balint, Benning, Bray, Ingram, and Mullin, text
- Recommendation of amendment agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth, Balint, Benning, Bray, Ingram, and Mullin
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48