+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on May 21, 2018
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- House proposal of amendment concurred in
- Consideration resumed
- Consideration postponed Shall the Senate concur with the House Proposal of Amendment?
On May 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed Shall the Senate concur in the House Proposal of Amendment?
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Benning
- House proposal of amendment; text
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
- Third Reading Ordered
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Reported without recommendation by Committee on Finance
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations
- Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations