+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (58)
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, signed by Governor June 8, 2022
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor on June 2, 2022
- Signed by Governor on June 8, 2022
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: House adopted Conference Committee report
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Report of Committee of Conference
- Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. LaClair of Barre Town
- Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
- Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sirotkin for Committee, text
- Committee of Conference report adopted
- As passed by Senate and House
- Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, report of Committee of Conference adopted
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Proposal of Amendment
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
- House proposal of amendment; text
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sirotkin; text
- Proposal of amendment agreed to
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Which was agreed to
- Speaker appointed Marcotte of Coventry, Kimbell of Woodstock and Jerome of Brandon as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Sirotkin, Clarkson, and Brock
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, Committee of Conference members appointed
- Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock moved the House refuse to concur and asked for a Committee of Conference
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
- Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment
- Read Second time
- Rep. Ancel of Calais recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
- Rep. Toleno of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
- Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock, Dickinson of St. Albans Town, Jerome of Brandon, Kascenska of Burke, Laroche of Franklin, Marcotte of Coventry, Mulvaney-Stanak of Burlington, Nicoll of Ludlow, Nigro of Bennington, and White of Bethel moved to amend the
- Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to
- Third Reading ordered
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
- Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
- New Business/Third Reading
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- New Business/Second Reading
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
February 26, 2021: Shall the bill pass?
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor