+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Mullin, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
- Floor amendment by Senator Mullin agreed to
- Pending third reading, Senator Mullin on behalf of the Committee on Judiciary moved to amend bill
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to next legislative day
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to next legislative day
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to next legislative day
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Read 2nd time
- Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee Bill for Second Reading
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48
+ − Vote
April 1, 2009: Shall the bill pass?
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Type:
Primary Sponsor