+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Motion disagreed to
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin moved to amend bill
- Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Rodgers
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth and Hardy
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
- Passed on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth and Hardy
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers
- Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
- Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pollina
- Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) White, Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pollina, text
- Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
- Recommendation of amendment agreed to
- Recommendation of Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
+ − Vote
April 3, 2019: Shall the bill pass?
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor