+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- Passed the House and Senate on 3/31/2010
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & adopted in concurrence
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator Hartwell for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- Consideration postponed; Second reading
On March 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Finance per Rule 51
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Read Third time
- Adopted
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 45
- Rep. Komline of Dorset demanded yeas and nays
- Which was disagreed to.
- Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe and Donahue of Northfield moved to substitute an amendment
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 49, Nays = 86
- Rep. Komline of Dorset demanded yeas and nays
- Rep. Poirier of Barre City spoke for the committee on Health Care
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read First time, treated as a bill and referred to committee on Health Care
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2010: Shall the House substitute the amendment as offered by Reps. Scheuermann of Stowe and Donahue of Northfield for the recommendation of amendment of the Committee on Health Care?
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 86
- Absent: 14
February 25, 2010: Shall the resolution be amended as propsed by the committeeon h
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor