+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Passed the House and Senate on 2/16/2010
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Adopted in concurrence
- New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Read and Adopted
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52