+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on July 1, 2020
- Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on July 1, 2020
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
- Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary
- Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
- Delivered to the Governor on June 30, 2020
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Burditt of West Rutland reported for the committee on Judiciary
- Read Second Time
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on June 10, 2020