+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on June 15, 2020
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on June 15, 2020
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on June 9, 2020
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Placed on Calendar for Notice on 5/29/2020
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
- 3rd reading ordered
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Read Third time and Passed
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Toll of Danville spoke for the committee on Appropriations
- Read Second Time
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on 5/15/2020