+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (67)
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
On May 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message House adopted Conference Committee report
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 12, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton.
- Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill)
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted
On May 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference report adopted
- Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mazza for Committee, text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message House appointed Conference Committee members
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
- House proposal of amendment; text
- House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mazza
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
- Speaker appointed Brennan of Colchester, Potter of Clarendon and Corcoran of Bennington as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mazza, Westman, and Flory
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Brennan of Colchester
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Mazza for Committee on Transportation
- Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment
- Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
- Roll Call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation, as amended, agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
- Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Mazza
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation
- New Business/Second Reading
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Transportation and Finance intact, on motion of Senator Ashe
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
- Which was agreed to
- Rep. Nolan of Morristown moved to amend the bill
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to.
- Rep. Helm of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Brennan of Colchester spoke for the committee on Transportation
- Read Second Time
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
- Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 13, 2018
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2018: Shall the report of the Committee on Transportation be amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations?
- Yeas: 29
- Absent: 1
May 7, 2018: Shall the bill be read the third time?
- Yeas: 29
- Absent: 1