+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on 5/17/16
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on 5/16/16
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 24 V.S.A. App. §147-3.2 - Elective Officers
- 24 V.S.A. App. §147-3.5 - Appointive officers
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor