+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
- Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rep. Sweaney of Windsor moved to postpone action until May 6, 2014 which was agreed to
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Pollina
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Pollina; text
- Read 2nd time
- Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations
- Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations
- Proposal of amendment agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
On April 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
- Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Baruth
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 37, Nays = 104
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Consejo of Sheldon and Devereux of Mount Holly disagreed to
- Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven moved to amend the bill
- Which was disagreed to
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 52, Nays = 89
- Third Reading Ordered
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 95, Nays = 47
- Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
- Read Third time
- Passed
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rep. Consejo of Sheldon and Devereux of Mount Holly moved to amend the bill
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven withdrawn
- Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven moved to amend the bill
- Report of the Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Johnson of South Hero reported for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Townsend of South Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar for Notice on March 25, 2014
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2014: Shall the bill be amended as proposed by Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven?
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 104
- Absent: 7
March 28, 2014: Shall the bill be amended as proposed by Rep. Consejo of Sheldon and others?
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 89
- Absent: 7
March 28, 2014: Shall the bill be read a third time?
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 47
- Absent: 6