+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 2, 2014
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
On April 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
- Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. O'Brien of Richmond reported for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Devereux of Mount Holly spoke for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar for Notice on march 13, 2014