+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on 5/17/16
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on 5/16/16
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
- 3rd reading ordered
- Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Baruth
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Reported favorably by Senator Degree for Committee on Finance
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules relieved of further consideration of the bill on motion of Senator Campbell
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
- Committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Campbell
- Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Government Operations intact, on motion of Senator White
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
- Rep. Condon of Colchester, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
- Rep. Martin of Wolcott reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways & Means per Rule 35(a)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor