+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Requested by Governor, Delivered on May 10, 2018
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Proposal of amendment agreed to
- Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
- Division of the Senate 22-6
- 3rd reading ordered
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
- Rep. Graham of Williamstown asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
- Rep. Graham of Williamstown moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations
- Rep. LaClair of Barre Town reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rep. LaClair of Barre Town moved to postpone action until March 14, 2018 which was agreed to
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor