+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on April 11, 2018
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on April 11, 2018
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Brumsted of Shelburne spoke for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on February 6, 2018