+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 27, 2014
- Signed by Governor on May 27, 2014
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Proposal of amendment not agreed to
- Senator(s) Snelling and Galbraith motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment; text
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration resumed
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Hartwell for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Reported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs with proposal of amendment
- Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Campbell
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Flory
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as moved by Senator(s) Bray and MacDonald
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Flory; text
- Proposal of amendment not agreed to
- Roll Call, requested by Senator Mullin, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 7, Nays = 22
- 3rd reading ordered
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- New Business/Second Reading
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs with the report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy intact, on motion of Senator Hartwell
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Hartwell
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
- Which was agreed to
- Rep. Ellis of Waterbury moved to amend the bill
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 44
- Amendment of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to
- Rep. Ellis of Waterbury reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Read Second Time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2014: Shall the Senate proposal of amendment be amended as proposed by Senator Flory
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2014: Shall the bill be read a third time?
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor