+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On May 12, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on 5/26/2010
- Delivered to the Governor on 5/21/2010
On May 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- As passed by Senate and House
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Committee of Conference report adopted
- Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mazza for Committee, text
On May 5, 2010 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset.
- Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill)
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
On May 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- New Business/Committee of Conference Report
On May 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Report
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mazza, Kitchel, and Scott
On April 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- House message House appointed Conference Committee members
On April 23, 2010 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Wright of Burlington
- Speaker appointed Brennan of Colchester, Corcoran of Bennington and Potter of Clarendon as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
- Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Brennan of Colchester
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Campbell
- New Business/Third Reading
- Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Campbell
- Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi
- Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
- Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Illuzzi
- Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Sears
- Senator Sears requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment
- Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Kitchel, Hartwell, Mazza, Scott, and Shumlin
- Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Ayer
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Mazza for Committee on Transportation
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation, as amended, agreed to
- Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
- Senator(s) Illuzzi motion to amend Committee on Transportation proposal of amendment; text
- Senator Illuzzi requested & granted leave to withdraw the third and fourth proposals of amendment
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Illuzzi agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation
- Second Reading
On April 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
- Which was agreed to.
- Rep. Masland of Thetford and Cheney of Norwich moved to amend the bill
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Howard of Cambridge moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Brennan of Colchester agreed to
- Rep. Minter of Waterbury spoke for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Brennan of Colchester spoke for the committee on Transportation
- Read Second Time
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on 3/19/2010
+ − Vote
April 21, 2010: Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
House Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor